Lugo v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company

Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: David Lugo
Case Number: 2:2010cv01640
Filed: September 23, 2010
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED counsel for the parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than March 31, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 3/21/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 4, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED counsel for the parties shall file a Joint Status Report regarding the status of the private binding arbitration no later than October 13, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 10/3/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 6, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED counsel for the parties shall file a Joint Status Report regarding the status of the private binding arbitration no later than December 16, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/6/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lugo v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert W Freeman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lugo
Represented By: Laurence B Springberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.