APREA II LIMITED PARTNERSHIP v. LAW OFFICE OF JACOB HAFTER et al

Plaintiff: APREA II LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Defendant: Jaclyn Hafter, Jacob Hafter and LAW OFFICE OF JACOB HAFTER
Case Number: 2:2010cv01687
Filed: September 28, 2010
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 23:1441 Contract Real Estate
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for the Filing of a statement regarding removed action by 11/4/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/21/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 8, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall file a joint status report no later than 4:00 p.m., November 16, 2010, ( Joint Status Report due by 11/16/2010.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/2/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
November 8, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the parties shall file a joint status report no later than 4:00 p.m., November 19, 2010, which must:( Joint Status Report due by 11/5/2010.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/5/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
November 10, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion to Remand to State Court. The case is remanded back to the Superior Court of the State of Arizona for the County of Maricopa. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/9/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CC: Order and Docket mmailed- SD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: APREA II LIMITED PARTNERSHIP v. LAW OFFICE OF JACOB HAFTER et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APREA II LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: David Cisewski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaclyn Hafter
Represented By: Jacob L Hafter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Hafter
Represented By: Jacob L Hafter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAW OFFICE OF JACOB HAFTER
Represented By: Jacob L Hafter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]