McCoy v. Astrue

Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Plaintiff: Linda R. McCoy
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv01972
Filed: November 10, 2010
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Roger L. Hunt
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2011 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Motion to Extend Deadline. Replies due by 7/23/2011 re 11 MOTION for Reversal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/6/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
October 19, 2011 19 Featured Case ORDER ACCEPTING and ADOPTING 18 Magistrate Judge Leen's Report of Findings and Recommendation. Plaintiff's Motion for Reversal 11 is DENIED and the case is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 10/19/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 1, 2010 4 Featured Case ORDER that Plaintiff shall file her Certificate of Interested Parties by 12/15/2010. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/30/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McCoy v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda R. McCoy
Represented By: Richard E Donaldson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]