Fleming v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al

Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Joseph Salvatore and Clark County Detention Center
Plaintiff: William W Fleming
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00131
Filed: January 25, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Roger L. Hunt
Referring Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2012 26 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 24 Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/6/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) Modified signing Judge on 3/6/2012. NEF Regenerated. (ASB)
April 25, 2012 29 Featured Case ORDER Granting 21 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 4/25/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
May 30, 2012 32 Featured Case ORDER that a hearing regarding Plaintiff William Flemings Emergency Motion to Compel Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department to Produce Documents Alleged to be Confidential and/or Privileged 31 is scheduled for 9:30 a.m., Friday, June 1 5, 2012 in Courtroom 3A. Opposition shall be filed on or before June 4, 2012 and the reply to the opposition shall be filed on or before June 11, 2012. The deadline for filing dispositive motions shall be extended to July 24, 2012. The joint pretria l order shall be filed not later than 30 days after the date set for filing dispositive motions or August 23, 2012. In the event dispositive motions are filed, the date for filing the joint pretrial order shall be suspended until 30 days after decision of the dispositive motions or further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/30/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
June 15, 2012 38 Featured Case ORDER that plaintiff Fleming's Emergency Motion to Compel 31 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendant LVMPD shall produce responsive documents within ten (10) days from the entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/15/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
February 28, 2013 49 Featured Case ORDER Denying 40 LVMPD's Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 44 and 46 Motions for Leave to File Document Under Seal are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that parties shall file a joint statement concerning discovery dispute to within 7 days from the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/28/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 13, 2013 51 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER that Plaintiff files under seal, on or before 3/25/13, documents that he wishes to provide to his expert witness. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the response to Plaintiff's document disclosures is due on or before 4/4/13. No reply is necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/13/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 22, 2013 56 Featured Case ORDER re 50 Status Report. Plaintiff may show his expert only the documents agreed to by LVMPD in the summary in Exhibit D and the documents previously stipulated to. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/22/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 18, 2013 60 Featured Case ORDER Granting 57 Motion to Reinstate 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. 40 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Court grants LVMPD leave to move for summary judgment on the claim for assault and battery within 14 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 15, 2011 7 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 6 Stipulation to Extend Deadline. Defendants will have until 5/16/2011 to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint or the parties will notify the Court that a settlement has been achieved. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 2/15/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fleming v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Thomas D Dillard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Salvatore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Detention Center
Represented By: Thomas D Dillard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William W Fleming
Represented By: Eric Blank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]