Righthaven LLC v. Allec et al Featured Case

Defendant: Rick Allec and RX Advertising, Inc. LLC
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00532
Filed: April 8, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2011 23 NOTICE by Defendant Rick Allec re 22 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,. Notice of Compliance With Court Order (DeVoy, James)
September 20, 2011 22 Featured Case ORDER Granting 21 Second Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by James M DeVoy as to Defendant Rick Allec. Service of Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel and Address of Defendant due by 9/26/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/19/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 14, 2011 21 Second MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by J. Malcolm DeVoy. by Defendant Rick Allec. Motion ripe 9/14/2011. (DeVoy, James)
September 14, 2011 20 Featured Case ORDER Denying without Prejudice 19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 13, 2011 19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by J. Malcolm DeVoy. by Defendant Rick Allec. Motion ripe 9/13/2011. (DeVoy, James)
August 22, 2011 18 REPLY to Response to 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Amended Complaint ; filed by Defendant Rick Allec. (DeVoy, James)
August 15, 2011 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 8/15/2011. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen no longer assigned to case. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:11-CV-0532 KJD-CWH. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
August 12, 2011 16 RESPONSE to 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Replies due by 8/22/2011. (Mangano, Shawn)
August 3, 2011 15 Featured Case ORDER Denying as Moot 11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/3/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
July 25, 2011 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant Rick Allec. Responses due by 8/11/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Allec, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(DeVoy, James)
July 11, 2011 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT As A Matter of Right Pursuant to FRCP 15(a)(1) with Jury Demand against Rick Allec, RX Advertising, Inc. LLC, filed by Righthaven LLC. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 11/8/2011. (Mangano, Shawn)
July 7, 2011 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim; by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Mangano, Shawn) Docket entry relationship modified on 7/7/2011 (SRK).
June 20, 2011 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Rick Allec. Responses due by 7/7/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(DeVoy, James)
June 20, 2011 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Righthaven LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Net Sortie Systems, LLC, Corporate Parent SI Content Monitor LLC, Other Affiliate Stevo Design, Inc. for Righthaven LLC added. Amended Certificate of Interested Parties. (Mangano, Shawn)
June 14, 2011 9 Featured Case ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 8 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint. Rick Allec answer due 6/20/2011. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 13, 2011 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Defendant Rick Allec. (DeVoy, James)
April 20, 2011 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Righthaven LLC. RX Advertising, Inc. LLC served on 4/14/2011, answer due 5/5/2011. (Mangano, Shawn)
April 20, 2011 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Righthaven LLC. Rick Allec served on 4/11/2011, answer due 5/2/2011. (Mangano, Shawn)
April 11, 2011 5 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint) (ASB)
April 11, 2011 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Righthaven LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Net Sortie Systems, LLC, Corporate Parent SI Content Monitor LLC for Righthaven LLC added.. (Mangano, Shawn)
April 8, 2011 3 Summons Issued as to RX Advertising, Inc. LLC, rick allec re 1 Complaint,. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(ECS)
April 8, 2011 2 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (ECS)
April 8, 2011 Case assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (ECS)
April 8, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against RX Advertising, Inc. LLC, rick allec (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-1946888), filed by Righthaven LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/18/2011. Proof of service due by 8/6/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10, # 2 Exhibit 11-19, # 3 Exhibit 20-28, # 4 Exhibit 29-37, # 5 Exhibit 38-46, # 6 Exhibit 47-55, # 7 Exhibit 56-64, # 8 Exhibit 65-73, # 9 Exhibit 74-76, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons) (Mangano, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. Allec et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Allec
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RX Advertising, Inc. LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: Shawn A. Mangano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]