United States of America v. $43,473.41 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $43,473.41 in United States Currency
Interested Party: STATE OF NEVADA - DETR
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00647
Filed: April 25, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
0 Judge: George Foley
1 Judge: Edward C. Reed
 
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 16 Motion to Vacate and Motion to Strike Part of the Notice of Electronic Filing in Docket #10, Requiring Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order due by 7/17/201 and Vacating the Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Deadline of August 1, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/26/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 19, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 27 Motion for Default Judgment of Forfeiture against defendant property, Samantha Carrillo, Efrain Garcia, Eloy Garcia, Eloy Garcia-Macias, Francisco Garcia, Nabor Garcia, Ramiro Garcia, Yolanda Garcia, Paola Moreno, and other persons or entities having an interest in the defendant property and in favor of the United States of America. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 9/19/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 12, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 6 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/12/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. $43,473.41 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel D. Hollingsworth
Represented By: Michael A Humphreys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $43,473.41 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: STATE OF NEVADA - DETR
Represented By: J. Thomas Susich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]