Armed Forces Bank, N.A. v. FSG-4, LLC et al

Defendant: FSG-4, LLC and John A. Ritter
Plaintiff: Armed Forces Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2011cv00654
Filed: April 26, 2011
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kyle S. Hirsch and approving Designation of Local Counsel Matthew G. Holland for Armed Forces Bank, N.A.. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/25/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 10, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that 25 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part. The claim for alleged breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing may proceed. The claim for equitable estoppel is dismissed. FURTHER ORDERED that 27 Motion to Strike is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/10/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 23, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 34 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/23/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 15, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 42 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/15/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armed Forces Bank, N.A. v. FSG-4, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FSG-4, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Ritter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armed Forces Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew G Holland
Represented By: Sean K. McElenney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]