Wear et al v. Sprint Communications Company L.P. et al

Defendant: Level 3 Communications, LLC, Qwest Communications Corporation, Sprint Communications Company L.P. and Wiltel Communications, LLC
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Wear and John Butcher
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00809
Filed: May 18, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2012 17 Featured Case ORDER that Arthur T. Susman, Charles R. Watkins and John R. Wylie shall register with CM/ECF and a Notice of Compliance with Special Order 109 shall be completed and filed no later than five (5) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/7/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 2, 2012 22 Featured Case ORDER Granting 21 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Level 3 Communications, LLC, Qwest Communications Corporation, Sprint Communications Company L.P., and Wiltel Communications, LLC answer due 8/2/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/2/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 2, 2012 41 Featured Case ORDER Granting 40 Unopposed Motion For Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Answer due 10/31/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/2/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 9, 2012 47 Featured Case ORDER Granting 44 Motion to Certify Class. Fairness Hearing set for 6/11/2013 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/9/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 18, 2013 57 Featured Case ORDER AND JUDGMENT Approving Class-Action Settlement and Directing Notice of Final Approval and Granting 49 Joint Motion. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 06/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 18, 2013 58 Featured Case ORDER Granting 49 Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses to Settlement Class Counsel and Easement Deed by Court Order in Settlement of Landowner Action. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 06/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC) Modified on 6/18/2013 (AC).
June 18, 2013 59 Featured Case ORDER Granting 54 Unopposed Motion to Allow Non-Compliant Exclusion Request and to Provide Notice of and Confirm All Exclusions. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 06/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 18, 2013 61 Featured Case JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Plaintiffs Elizabeth Wear, John Butcher, and Carmen Worstell's Settlement Class Counsel and against Settling Defendants Sprint Communications Company L.P., Qwest Communications Corporation, Level 3 Communications, LLC, and Wiltel Communications, LLC, in the amount of $671,000. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 06/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 18, 2013 62 Featured Case ORDER Granting 49 Easement Deed by Court Order in Settlement of Landowner Action. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 06/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
September 10, 2013 64 Featured Case ORDER Granting 63 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/10/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 26, 2014 66 Featured Case ORDER Granting 65 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. The Garretson Resolution Group, Inc. shall disburse 4.446 percent of the Nevada fee-and-expense award from the Nevada Fiber Optic Counsel Qualified Settlement Funds to the Susman Group. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/25/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wear et al v. Sprint Communications Company L.P. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Level 3 Communications, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qwest Communications Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Communications Company L.P.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiltel Communications, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Wear
Represented By: William T. Gotfryd
Represented By: Mario P. Lovato
Represented By: Arthur T. Susman
Represented By: Charles R Watkins
Represented By: John R Wylie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Butcher
Represented By: William T. Gotfryd
Represented By: Mario P. Lovato
Represented By: Arthur T. Susman
Represented By: Charles R Watkins
Represented By: John R Wylie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]