Paulus v. US Department of Education et al

Plaintiff: Franklin Carl Paulus
Defendant: Progressive Financial Services, Inc., US Department of Education and Michigan State University
Case Number: 2:2011cv00903
Filed: June 3, 2011
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 20 Motion to Extend Time to Answer/Respond. US Department of Education answer due 2/29/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/31/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 8, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 22 Motion to Extend Time to Respond. US Department of Education answer due 3/30/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/8/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 28, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 25 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/28/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paulus v. US Department of Education et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Carl Paulus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Financial Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Education
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan State University
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]