Warner et al v. Napolitano et al

Plaintiff: Wael Choughari and Alexandra Warner
Defendant: Leander Holston, Alejandro Mayorkas, Janet Napolitano and Christina Poulos
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01060
Filed: June 28, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2011 14 Featured Case ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall have up to and including 11/14/11 to file proof of service of the summons and complaint within the allowed time. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/27/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 19, 2011 26 Featured Case ORDER Granting 24 Motion to Extend Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint. Leander Holston answer due 2/17/2012; Alejandro Mayorkas answer due 2/17/2012; Janet Napolitano answer due 2/17/2012; Christina Poulos answer due 2/17/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/19/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 28, 2011 27 Featured Case ORDER Granting 23 Motion for Leave to Appear as Government Attorney for Attorney Sherease R. Pratt for defendants Leander Holston, Alejandro Mayorkas, Janet Napolitano, and Christina Poulos. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/28/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Warner et al v. Napolitano et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wael Choughari
Represented By: Anthony D. Guenther
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Warner
Represented By: Anthony D. Guenther
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leander Holston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Poulos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]