Coleman-Toll Limited Partnership vs Rehau, Inc.

Defendant: Rehau, Inc.
Plaintiff: Coleman-Toll Limited Partnership
Case Number: 2:2011cv01227
Filed: July 27, 2011
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/18/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 28, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 23 Motion to Stay Pending Transfer to MDL and Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 11/28/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 9, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by MDL Panel on 2/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
February 25, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. This case is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 02/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman-Toll Limited Partnership vs Rehau, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rehau, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coleman-Toll Limited Partnership
Represented By: Rick R. Hsu
Represented By: Donald A. Lattin
Represented By: Carolyn K. Renner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]