Stickrod v. State Of Nevada et al

Respondent: Sheryl Foster and State Of Nevada
Petitioner: Lisa Stickrod
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01430
Filed: September 6, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2012 15 Featured Case ORDER that petitioners motions to proceed in forma pauperis 6 10 are DENIED as moot. Petitioners motion to extend time for filing notice of appeal nunc pro tunc and/or correction or clarification of record 2 is DENIED. Petitioners motion for l eave to file excess pages 7 is GRANTED. The clerk SHALL detach the petition and file it in a separate docket entry. The clerk SHALL amend the docket entry for ECF No. 9 and retitle it Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Petition ers motion for discovery 11 is DENIED without prejudice as premature. Petitioners motion for bail 12 and motion to proceed with appeal on original records of appeal 13 are DENIED. The clerk shall ELECTRONICALLY SERVE the petition and the brief in support of the petition upon the respondents. Respondents shall have forty-five (45) days from entry of this order within which to answer, or otherwise respond to, the petition. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/30/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
March 9, 2012 19 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 Motion to Extend Deadline. Respondents shall respond to Petition by 5/14/2012 Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
January 23, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER Granting 20 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss. The petition for writ of habeas corpus is DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 23 Motion for an Order to Show Cause is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner is DENIED A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/23/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 19, 2011 3 Featured Case ORDERED that the clerk shall send petitioner a blank motion to proceed in forma pauperis form with instructions. Petitioner shall have 30 days to file an amended motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or to have the full $5 .00 filing fee sent to the clerk. Clerk shall send petitioner a blank §2254 form with instructions. Petitioner shall have 45 days within which to refile a revised petition using only the court approved form. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/19/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; extra copy of order to P; §2254 form w/instructions; ifp form w/instructions - MMM)
December 5, 2011 8 Featured Case ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the clerk SHALL FILE ECF Nos. 1-5 in casenumber 2:11-cv-01430-JCM-GWF. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk SHALL FILE this order in the instant case and in case number 2:11-cv-01430-JCM-GWF. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk SHALL CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/5/11.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Stickrod v. State Of Nevada et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheryl Foster
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State Of Nevada
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lisa Stickrod
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]