Waterfall Homeowners Association et al v. Viega, Inc. et al

Defendant: Interstate Services, James P. Manning, Uponor Corporation, Uponor Group, Uponor Wirsbo Company, Uponor, Inc., VG Pipe, LLC, Vanguard Industries, Inc., Vanguard Piping Systems, Inc., Viega GMBH & Co. KG, Viega International GMBH, Viega, Inc., Viega, LLC, Wirsbo Company, Interstate Plumbing and Air Conditioning, LLC, Dynamic Plumbing Systems, Inc. of Nevada, Interstate Plumbing and Air Conditioning, Inc. and Centex Homes
Plaintiff: Red Bluffs at the Crossings Owners Association, Inc. and Waterfall Homeowners Association
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01498
Filed: September 16, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
 
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2012 104 Featured Case ORDER Denying, as a motion to deny class certification, 38 Motion to Strike. FURTHER ORDERED that 37 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that 41 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 42 Motion to Dismiss or Consolidate is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that 78 Motion to Stay is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 80 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 85 Motion to Review Magistrate Judge's Order is DENIED as moot. (See Order for details). Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 12, 2012 125 Featured Case ORDER Denying 121 Motion to Compel Joinder. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/11/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 26, 2012 127 Featured Case ORDER Granting 106 Motion to Reconsider. FURTHER ORDERED that the Motions to Reconsider 107 , 108 , 109 are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/26/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 24, 2013 130 Featured Case ORDER that 128 Motion for Clarification is GRANTED, and the following sentence found on lines 15-16 of page 6 of 127 Order is STRICKEN: "The Court has already certified the question to the Nevada Supreme Court in another case." Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/24/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 8, 2013 131 Featured Case ORDER that all claims related to the Vanguard/Viega plumbing system are SEVERED from the following cases: Southern Terrace Homeowners Association v. Viega, Inc., No. 2:12-cv-206; and Anthem Highlands Community Association v. Viega, Inc. , No. 2:12-cv-207. FURTHER ORDERED that the Vanguard/Viega claims severed from the Southern Terrace Homeowners Association v. Viega, Inc., No. 2:12-cv-206; and Anthem Highlands Community Association v. Viega, Inc., No. 2:12-cv-2 07 actions are CONSOLIDATED for all purposes, including discovery and trial, as member cases into the lead Vanguard/Viega case Waterfall Homeowners Association v. Viega, Inc., No. 2:11-cv-1498. FURTHER ORDERED that all discovery in the consolidated Uponor/Wirsbo and Vanguard/Viega actions shall be coordinated to the greatest extent possible so as to minimize the expense and burden on all parties in these actions.FURTHER ORDERED that all further Vanguard/Viega-related plead ings and papers shall be filed in the lead Vanguard/Viega case only. Plaintiffs in the lead Vanguard/Viega case shall have leave to file a consolidated amended complaint within 10 days of entry of this order. The amended complaint shall not add addit ional legal theories and shall conform to all of the Courts prior orders in the Waterfall action.FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter this Order into the dockets of this action, the lead Vanguard case, and the two Vanguard member cases. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/8/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 25, 2011 33 Featured Case ORDER Granting Request to Appoint Special Process Service as to Viega GMBH & Co. KG and Viega International GMBH. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/25/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
January 18, 2012 71 Featured Case ORDERED that case 2:11-cv-01498-JCM-VCF is REASSIGNED to Chief Judge Jones and Magistrate Judge Foley for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/18/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 30, 2012 77 Featured Case ORDERED that 49 the Vanguard/Viega Defendants' Joint Motion to Sever Claims against Different Products and 54 Defendant Centex Homes' Joinder in the Motion to Sever and 56 the Uponor/Wirsbo Defendants' Joinder in the Motion to Sever are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 1/30/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 9, 2012 81 Featured Case ORDER Denying Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by MDL Panel on 2/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Waterfall Homeowners Association et al v. Viega, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P. Manning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor Group
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor Wirsbo Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VG Pipe, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Industries, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Piping Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viega GMBH & Co. KG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viega International GMBH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viega, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viega, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wirsbo Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Plumbing and Air Conditioning, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynamic Plumbing Systems, Inc. of Nevada
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Plumbing and Air Conditioning, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centex Homes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Bluffs at the Crossings Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Scott K. Canepa
Represented By: James D. Carraway
Represented By: J. Randall Jones
Represented By: Francis I Lynch
Represented By: Robert C. Maddox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waterfall Homeowners Association
Represented By: Scott K. Canepa
Represented By: James D. Carraway
Represented By: J. Randall Jones
Represented By: Francis I Lynch
Represented By: Robert C. Maddox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]