Arsenal, Inc. v. Neal

Plaintiff: Arsenal, Inc.
Defendant: Adam Neal
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01628
Filed: October 7, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
 
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER that 11 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff submit a proposed injunction granting its motion for injunctive relief in accordance with this order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/31/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 28, 2013 17 Featured Case PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/28/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 7, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER Granting 18 Motion for Judgment, for a Permanent Injunction, and for Dismissal of Remaining Claims without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk enter JUDGMENT for Plaintiff and against Defendant in the amount of $19,000.00 FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's libel claim and all other claims arising from the Boycott Video are DISMISSED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff file a proposed permanent injunction within 14 days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/7/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 9, 2014 25 Featured Case PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/9/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
July 9, 2014 26 Featured Case ORDER granting 23 Motion for Attorney Fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that JUDGMENT for attorneys fees and costs be entered for Plaintiff and against Defendant in the amount of $15,167.83. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/9/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
July 10, 2014 27 Featured Case JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Plaintiff, Arsenal, Inc. and against Defendant, Adam Neal. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 7/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Arsenal, Inc. v. Neal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arsenal, Inc.
Represented By: Terry A. Coffing
Represented By: Brian R. Hardy
Represented By: Keith D. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Neal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]