Charleston and Jones, LLC et al v. Uponor, Inc. et al

Defendant: Western States Plumbing, Inc., Viega, Inc., Viega, LLC, Vanguard Piping Systems, Inc., Viega NA, Inc., Uponor North America, Inc., Uponor, Inc., Uponor Corporation, Uponor Group and RCR Plumbing & Mechanical
Plaintiff: Charleston and Jones, LLC and Copper Creek II, LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01637
Filed: October 10, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by MDL Panel on 2/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
February 27, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 38 Motion to Stay. This action is stayed pending the opinion and mandate in Ninth Ciruit Case No. 10-15439, except as to 32 Pending Motion to Sever Claims. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 22, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 32 Defendants' Motion to Sever Claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the new and separate action against Vanguard Piping Systems, Viega, LLC, Viega Inc., and Viega NA be filed within 14 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 05/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 16, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 67 Motion for Relief is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Charleston and Jones, LLC et al v. Uponor, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western States Plumbing, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viega, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia K. Lundvall
Represented By: Amanda C Yen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viega, LLC
Represented By: Patricia K. Lundvall
Represented By: Amanda C Yen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Piping Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia K. Lundvall
Represented By: Amanda C Yen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viega NA, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia K. Lundvall
Represented By: Amanda C Yen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor North America, Inc.
Represented By: Peter C Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor, Inc.
Represented By: Peter C Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor Corporation
Represented By: Peter C Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor Group
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCR Plumbing & Mechanical
Represented By: R. Scott Rasmussen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charleston and Jones, LLC
Represented By: Robert T. Robbins
Represented By: James W Pengilly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Copper Creek II, LLC
Represented By: Robert T. Robbins
Represented By: James W Pengilly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]