Kurth et al v. Holston et al

Defendant: Leander B. Holston, Girlie Kurth and John Morton
Plaintiff: Eric Kurth
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01638
Filed: October 11, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
 
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear as Government Attorney by Bradley B. Banias, for Leander B. Holston,Bradley B. Banias for John Morton. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/3/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 19, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 12 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 11 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 4/5/2012. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/19/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 24, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Case terminated. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/24/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 31, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff shall file his Certificate as to Interested Parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than 4:00 p.m., November 10, 2011. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/27/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
January 13, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 8 Motion to Extend Time to Answer/Respond. Leander B. Holston answer due 2/20/2012; John Morton answer due 2/20/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/13/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kurth et al v. Holston et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leander B. Holston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Girlie Kurth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Morton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Kurth
Represented By: Michael P. Kimbrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]