Duensing v. Gilbert et al

Defendant: David Michael Gilbert, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and Taser International Inc.
Plaintiff: Raymond James Duensing, Jr
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01747
Filed: October 28, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Taser International Inc. Response due by 12/13/2012. Reply due by 12/20/2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) conference must be held on or before February 18, 2013, regardless of whether the court has issued a ruling on 9 motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/3/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 28, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Accepting 35 Report and Recommendation, in full, to the extent that it is not inconsistent with this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims for unreasonable seizure (claim 1); intentional infliction of emotional distress (claim 2); excessive force (claim 4); police negligence (claim 5); assault and battery (claim 8); and falsifying and destroying evidence (claim 10) are DISMISSED with prejudice, as they relate to Defendant Taser International Inc., for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 03/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 7, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 44 Defendant's Motion to Compel and Granting 45 Defendants' Motion for Award of Costs and Fees. Plaintiff must serve Defendants with responses to all discovery requests by 07/08/2013. Plaintiff must pay Defendants reasonable expenses in preparing the 44 motion and 49 reply in the amount of $1,007.00 by 07/08/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 06/07/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 6, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 53 Defendant's Motion to Compel and for Award of Costs. Plaintiff must serve Defendant with responses to all discovery requests, without objection, on or before 9/6/2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before 9/6/2013, Pl aintiff must pay Defendants reasonable expenses incurred as a result of Plaintiffs failure to appear at the deposition in the amount of $999.97. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 08/05/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 9, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, on 12/9/2013 by Deputy Clerk: Ari Caytuero. IT IS ORDERED that 69 Defendant's Motion for Exception to Corporate and Insurance Representative Attendance at Settlement Conference is GRANTED with the condition that if contact is necessary, Defendant Tasers corporate and insurance representatives must be promptly available by telephone. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 12, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, on 12/12/2013 by Deputy Clerk: Ari Caytuero. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff must submit to chambers his confidential settlement statement by 4:00 a.m., Friday, 12/13/2013 re 67 Order Scheduling Settlement Conference. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CC: Plaintiff via mail and email - AC) Modified on 12/12/2013 (AC).
February 4, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Accepting and Adopting in full 74 Report and Recommendation.Granting 56 Motion for Involuntary Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/4/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Duensing v. Gilbert et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Michael Gilbert
Represented By: Thomas D Dillard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taser International Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond James Duensing, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]