JS Products, Inc. v. Kabo Tool Company

Counter Claimant: Kabo Tool Company
Defendant: Kabo Tool Company
Counter Defendant: JS Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: JS Products, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv01856
Filed: November 17, 2011
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2013 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 105 Defendant's Motion for leave to File Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 2, 2013 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 149 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/2/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 9, 2013 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 139 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/9/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 3, 2013 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 120 Kabo's Motion to Compel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that JS Products shall make productions in compliance with this Order on or before August 4, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/3/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 13, 2014 240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 179 Kabo Tool Company's Motion to File Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/13/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 13, 2014 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 215 Motion to File Exhibit Under Seal. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/13/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 19, 2014 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 177 Motion to Reconsider is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 210 Motion to Strike Supplemental Invalidity Contentions is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that 233 Emergency Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Expert Reports is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/19/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 2, 2014 248 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 4/2/2014. ORDERED that 244 Motion to Reconsider the Court's Order to Allow Previously Scheduled Expert Discovery to Occur Order is GRANTED as follows: 1) Discovery cut- off date is April 11, 2014; and 2) Dispositive motions cut-off date is thirty (30) days after entry of the Claim Construction Order.FURTHER ORDERED that a Claim Construction Hearing currently set for 09:00 A.M. on Tuesday, April 29, 2014, in RENO COURTROOM 6, before District Judge Robert C. Jones is ADVANCED to TUESDAY, APRIL 15, 2014 @ 09:00 A.M., and if needed, WEDNESDAY, APRIL 16, 2014, in RENO COURTROOM 6, before Judge Robert C. Jones. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 17, 2014 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the four (4) disputed claim terms in U.S. Patent No. 7,066,057 are construed according to this Order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 2, 2014 274 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 254 Motion for Sanctions is GRANTED in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/2/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 4, 2014 323 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 308 Motion to Seal 310 Declaration and 309 Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 06/03/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 24, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 10 Motion to Dismiss claims Two and Three with Leave to Amend. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/24/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
June 26, 2014 369 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 301 Motion to Compel Production of Measurements Taken by JS Products, Inc.'s Expert Gene Olson is GRANTED as follows: 1. JS Products shall produce Mr. Olson's measurements of the accused wrenches to Defendants on or before July 9, 2014.2. Defendants may reopen Mr. Olsons deposition for the purpose of questioning him about his measurements of the accused wrenches. JS Products shall produce Mr. Olson for further deposition on this issue, at its own expense, and at a reasonable date, time and location to be agreed upon by the parties, or as hereafter ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/26/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 19, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/19/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 28, 2014 373 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Claim 1 of U.S. Patent No. 7,066,057 is declared INVALID.FURTHER ORDERED that 277 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 294 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. The sealed version of th e motion 298 is likewise DENIED.FURTHER ORDERED that the pending Motions to SEAL 281 , 289 , 297 , 317 , 328 , 349 , 357 , and 365 are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/28/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 9, 2014 375 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff JS Products, Inc. and against Defendants Kabo Tool Company and Chih-Ching Hsieh on JSP's claim for declaratory judgment of patent invalidity, and in favor of JSP on Defendants' counterclaim for patent i nfringement. Defendants shall take nothing by way of their counterclaim. All remaining claims and defenses are hereby dismissed withoutprejudice as moot. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/9/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 15, 2014 397 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 286 Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED as follows: (1.) Plaintiff JS Products, Inc. shall pay to Defendant Kabo Tool Company attorneys' fees and costs in the total amount of $10,667.00 in relation to Kabo's Motion for S anctions 254 . (2.) Because Plaintiff JS Products, Inc. has filed a Motion for Attorneys Fees and Expenses 377 , as the prevailing party in this action, the payment of the foregoing award of fees and costs to Defendant Kabo Tool Company is stayed p ending a decision on JS Products, Inc.'s motion for fees and expenses. If JS Products is awarded fees and costs on its motion, then the foregoing amount awarded to Defendant Kabo Tool Company may be offset against such award. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/15/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 5, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for 8/23/2012 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 07/05/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 23, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 42 Defendant's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Granting in part and Denying in part 43 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery. The parties are hereby ordered to produce samples of their conventional wrench products and/or documents in accordance with the foregoing provisions of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall make their respective productions in compliance with this order on or before November 27, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/23/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JS Products, Inc. v. Kabo Tool Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Kabo Tool Company
Represented By: Andrew P Gordon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kabo Tool Company
Represented By: Andrew P Gordon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: JS Products, Inc.
Represented By: R. Scott Weide
Represented By: Kendelee Leascher-Works
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JS Products, Inc.
Represented By: Kendelee Leascher-Works
Represented By: R. Scott Weide
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]