Rhodes-Lyons v. United States of America et al

Defendant: United States of America, Desiree Harkema, Internal Revenue Service, Leslie Rogers and Department Of The Treasury
Plaintiff: Diane L. Rhodes-Lyons
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01906
Filed: November 28, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7426 IRS: Wrongful Levy for Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2012 17 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Defendants Desiree Harkema, Leslie Rogers, Department of the Treasury, and Internal Revenue Service are DISMISSED as defendants in this action. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 06/22/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 2, 2012 21 Featured Case ORDER Denying 20 Motion for Notice on Federal Questions and Damages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/2/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 17, 2012 22 Featured Case ORDER Denying 19 Plaintiff's Motion for Notice of Error. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/16/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
April 15, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER Denying 32 Plaintiff's Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/13/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USCA - EDS)
February 7, 2012 6 Featured Case ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file the Complaint. Service of the Complaint must be accomplished in a manner consistent with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/7/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rhodes-Lyons v. United States of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desiree Harkema
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Rogers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department Of The Treasury
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane L. Rhodes-Lyons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]