HICA Education Loan Corporation vs Henry

Defendant: Jerry T. Henry
Plaintiff: HICA Education Loan Corporation
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01925
Filed: December 1, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12:1821 Default of Loan by Promissary Note
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of HICA Education Loan Corporation against Jerry T. Henry. Plaintiff is awarded judgment against Defendant for $44,465.71, with additional prejudgment interest from April 24, 2012 to the date of this judgment at the r ate of $3.76 per day. This judgment shall bear interest from the date of this judgment until it is paid at a variable rate calculated by the Secretary of the Department of Health and Human Services for each calendar quarter and computed by deter mining the average of the bond equivalent rates for the ninety-one day U.S. Treasury Bills auctioned during the preceding quarter, plus three percent, rounding this figure up to the nearest one-eighth of one percent. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/2/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 16, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff, HICA Education Loan Corporation is awarded attorneys' fees against Defendant Jerry T. Henry in the amount of $2,482.00 plus court costs in the amount of $461.44. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/16/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 16, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of HICA Education Loan Corporation against Jerry T. Henry. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 7/16/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
September 4, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 19 Government's Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/4/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: HICA Education Loan Corporation vs Henry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry T. Henry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HICA Education Loan Corporation
Represented By: Russell G Gubler
Represented By: Matthew L. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]