Herb Reed Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Monroe Powell's Platters, LLC et al

Defendant: Monroe Powell, Monroe Powell's Platters, LLC and Dan Gloude
Plaintiff: Herb Reed Enterprises, LLC and Herb Reed Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv02010
Filed: December 15, 2011
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Amending 109 Order Granting Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 11, 2013 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 110 Motion for Attorney Fees and Expenses. To the extent Defendants and/or their attorneys would like to present further argument in light of this notice, they may do so in writing no later than 6/18/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 14, 2013 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring a Supplemental Declaration. No later than 6/19/2013 Plaintiffs shall file a supplemental declaration. Defendants and their counsel may file a response no later than 6/21/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/14/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 14, 2013 120 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE AND ORDER re 95 Order to Show Cause. To the extent Defendant Powell and/or his attorneys would like to present further argument in light of this notice they may do so in writing by 6/21/2013. To the extent Plaintiffs seek other fees and co sts beyond those related to the motion to compel, Plaintiffs shall submit a declaration outlining those expenses by 6/19/2013. Defendant Powell and his counsel may file a response by 6/21/2013. If a response is filed, Plaintiffs may file a reply by 6/25/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/14/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 11, 2013 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 111 and 124 Motions to Seal are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/11/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 11, 2013 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 110 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that 82 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing set for July 25, 2013 before United States District Judge Pro is hereby VACATED. FURTHER ORDERED that 99 Motion to Strike is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/11/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 11, 2013 130 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 95 Order to Show Cause. The Court RECOMMENDS that Mr. Powell's answer be stricken and that default judgment be entered against him. ORDER that 110 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs is GRANTED in part. The C ourt ORDERS that Mr. Powell and his attorney, Erik Fitting, are jointly and severally responsible to pay $5,952.26 in attorneys' fees and costs to Plaintiffs. FURTHER ORDERED that 89 Emergency MOTION to Compel is DENIED as moot as it relates to Mr. Powell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/11/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 17, 2013 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 131 , 132 , and 133 Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation are OVERRULED and that the 130 Report and Recommendation is AFFIRMED. Defendant Powell's Answer is STRICKEN and default judgment is en tered against Defendants and on behalf of Plaintiffs. The Magistrate Judge's Orders regarding attorneys fees and Plaintiffs motion to compel are also AFFIRMED.The Clerk of Court shall forthwith enter default judgment in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants accordingly. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 9/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 18, 2013 150 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs Herb Reed Enterprises, Inc. and Herb Reed Enterprises, LLC against Defendant Monroe Powell. Mr. Powell and his attorney, Erik Fitting, are jointly and severally responsible to pay $5,952.26 in attorneys' fees and costs to Plaintiffs. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 9/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 16, 2013 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court will hold a Hearing on 153 Motion for an Order to Show Cause on Monday, February 10, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Philip M. Pro. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall forthwith serve non-parties Maurey Ro binson and Picone & Robinson with their Second Motion for an Order to Show Cause Why Defendants, Maurey Robinson and Picone & Robinson Should not be Held in Contempt and Sanctioned (Doc. #153), together with a copy of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that 154 Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 12/16/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 8, 2014 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 153 Motion for Order to Show Cause. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Monroe Powell's Platter, LLC, Monroe Powell, and Don Gloude, and nonparties Maurey Robinson and Picone & Robinson violated this Court's 2/1/2012 p reliminary injunction order and are held in civil contempt. Defendants shall ensure ARB Productions website is compliant within 30 days from the date of this order, or the Court will impose a fine of $100 per day. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs may file a motion for attorney's fees and costs associated with this Motion within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 8/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 15, 2014 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs Herb Reed Enterprises, Inc. and Herb Reed Enterprises, LLC shall file proof of service of 174 Plaintiffs' Motion for Fees and Costs as to nonparties Maurey Robinson and Picone & Robinson within 7 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 9/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 6, 2014 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 174 Plaintiff Herb Reed Enterprises, Inc. and Herb Reed Enterprises, LLC's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter Judgment in favor of Plaintiffs Herb Reed Enterprises, I nc. and Herb Reed Enterprises, LLC, and against Defendants Monroe Powell's Platters, LLC; Monroe Powell; and Don Gloude, and nonparties Maurey Robinson and Picone & Robinson in the amount of $5,721.00 in attorney's fees and $43 0.00 in costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' counsel shall serve a copy of this Order and the Judgment on nonparties Maurey Robinson and Picone & Robinson. Plaintiffs' counsel shall file proof of service within seven (7) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/6/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 7, 2014 186 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Plaintiffs Herb Reed Enterprises, Inc. and Herb Reed Enterprises, LLC, and against Defendants Monroe Powell's Platters, LLC, Monroe Powell, and Don Gloude, and nonparties Maurey Robinson and Picone & Robinson in the amount of $5,721.00 in attorney's fees and $430.00 in costs. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 10/6/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 1, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff Herb Reed Enterprises, Inc. and Herb Reed Enterprises, LLCs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction 4 is GRANTED to the extend described in the Order. Plaintiffs Herb Reed Enterprises, Inc. and Herb Reed Enterprises, LLC shall sec ure this Preliminary Injunction by posting a bond in the amount of $10,000.00 with the Clerk of Court on or before February 13, 2012. Plaintiffs Herb Reed Enterprises, Inc. and Herb Reed Enterprises, LLC shall either (1) file an amended complain t adding Herb Reed as a plaintiff, or (2) offer evidence that Herb Reed has assigned his common law rights in The Platters to one or both Plaintiffs on or before February 13, 2012. This Preliminary Injunction will not go into effect until Plaintiffs comply with this requirement. Clerk of Court shall amend the caption to correct the name of Defendant Dan Gloude to Don Gloude. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 2/1/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS, cc: finance)
March 29, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that parties shall file a Joint Interim Discovery Status Report on 7/12/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 3/29/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 9, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER substituting Monroe Powell, in Proper Person, in place of Attorney John R. DaCorsi and Jason L Rumsey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 8/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
August 9, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER substituting Don Gloude, in Proper Person, in place of Attorney John R. DaCorsi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 8/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
August 22, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a Motion Hearing is set for 9/13/2012 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston re 48 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 8/22/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 24, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 62 Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 10/17/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 24, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 45 Defendants' Motion for Withdrawal of Admissions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 10/24/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 26, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 86 Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs pending motion to compel suffers from two threshold defects: (1) it does not contain a proper meet and confer certification and (2) it provides no discussion why it should be considered despite being filed after the dispositive motion cut-off. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 19, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Motion Hearing re 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction for 12/27/2011 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Philip M. Pro. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall immediately notify Defe ndants of the hearing, and shall forthwith serve Defendants with any documents that are presently on file in this action, together with a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 12/19/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herb Reed Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Monroe Powell's Platters, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe Powell
Represented By: John R. DaCorsi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe Powell's Platters, LLC
Represented By: John R. DaCorsi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Gloude
Represented By: John R. DaCorsi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herb Reed Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: John L. Krieger
Represented By: Eric M Sommers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herb Reed Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Eric M Sommers
Represented By: John L. Krieger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]