Pepsico, Inc. et al v. Ram Traders, Ltd. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Frito-Lay North America, Inc. and Pepsico, Inc.
Defendant: Ram Traders, Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2011cv02017
Filed: December 16, 2011
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2012 11 Featured Case ORDER Granting 8 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel I. Hwang and approving Attorney William R. Urga as Designation of Local Counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/31/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 31, 2012 10 Featured Case ORDER Granting 7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan S. Jennings and approving Attorney William R. Urga as Designation of Local Counsel as to plaintiffs. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/31/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 30, 2012 9 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Frito-Lay North America, Inc., Pepsico, Inc. to the Court Regarding Admission Pro Hac Vice of Philip Barengolts (Urga, William)
January 27, 2012 8 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Daniel I. Hwang and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel William R. Urga (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2255093) filed by Plaintiffs Frito-Lay North America, Inc., Pepsico, Inc.. Motion ripe 1/27/2012. (Urga, William)
January 27, 2012 7 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan S. Jennings and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel William R. Urga (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2255079) filed by Plaintiffs Frito-Lay North America, Inc., Pepsico, Inc.. Motion ripe 1/27/2012. (Urga, William)
December 19, 2011 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Frito-Lay North America, Inc., Pepsico, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Urga, William)
December 16, 2011 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Jonathan S. Jennings, Phillip Barengolts, and Daniel In Hwang to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Counsel is also required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 1/30/2012.(no image attached) (MJZ)
December 16, 2011 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint) (SLR) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/16/2011) (SLR).
December 16, 2011 3 Summons Issued as to Ram Traders, Ltd. re 1 Complaint. (SLR)
December 16, 2011 2 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (SLR)
December 16, 2011 Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston. (SLR)
December 16, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against Ram Traders, Ltd. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-2215197), filed by Pepsico, Inc., Frito-Lay North America, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/26/2011. Proof of service due by 4/14/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (Urga, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pepsico, Inc. et al v. Ram Traders, Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frito-Lay North America, Inc.
Represented By: Phillip Barengolts
Represented By: Daniel In Hwang
Represented By: Jonathan S. Jennings
Represented By: William R. Urga
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pepsico, Inc.
Represented By: Phillip Barengolts
Represented By: Daniel In Hwang
Represented By: Jonathan S. Jennings
Represented By: William R. Urga
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ram Traders, Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]