Ivey v Spilotro, et al

Defendant: David Chesnoff, Phillip Ivey, Jr. and John Spilotro
Plaintiff: Luciaetta Ivey
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv02044
Filed: December 20, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2012 22 Featured Case ORDER Granting 13 Motion to Seal Documents from Sealed Eighth Judicial District Court Family Division Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 2/15/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 9, 2012 35 Featured Case ORDER that the Motions to Dismiss 9 14 18 are DENIED. The Motion for Demand for Security of Costs 7 is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
October 18, 2012 39 Featured Case ORDER Granting 38 Motion for Clarification of 35 Order. The order of July 9, 2012 35 is hereby AMENDED to omit the sentence beginning with the word Although on line 10 of page 18 and ending with the word adjudication on line 11 of page 18. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/18/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ivey v Spilotro, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Chesnoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Ivey, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Spilotro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luciaetta Ivey
Represented By: William Gary Logan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]