Boyd Gaming Corporation v. King Zulu, LLC Featured Case

Defendant: King Zulu, LLC
Plaintiff: Boyd Gaming Corporation
Case Number: 2:2012cv00016
Filed: January 5, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2012 17 (1st Notice) PURSUANT TO SPECIAL ORDER 109: that Joanna M Myers is in violation of Special Order 109. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website to register for CM/ECF. (MJZ)
February 3, 2012 16 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/3/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
February 3, 2012 Case Unsealed per 15 Minutes of Proceedings. (ASB)
February 3, 2012 15 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 2/3/2012 before Judge James C. Mahan. Crtrm Administrator: David Oakes; Pla Counsel: Laura Bielinski; Def Counsel: None Appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Joan Quiros; Time of Hearing: 1:30 p.m.; Courtroom: 6A; After representation of counsel the Court granted 13 Motion to Unseal and 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and signed the proposed order in open court. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO)
January 24, 2012 13 MOTION to Unseal Proceedings by Plaintiff Boyd Gaming Corporation. Motion ripe 1/24/2012. (ASB)
January 24, 2012 12 NOTICE of Registrar Compliance and Service by E-Mail by Plaintiff Boyd Gaming Corporation. (ASB)
January 24, 2012 11 NOTICE of Filing Registrar Certificate by Plaintiff Boyd Gaming Corporation. (ASB)
January 23, 2012 14 CERTIFICATE of Cash Deposit as to Boyd Gaming Corporation: $ 100, receipt number 8878 (Attachments: # 1 Receipt # 8878) (ASB)
January 23, 2012 10 SEALED CERTIFICATE of Check Deposit as to Laura E. Bielinski, an attorney with the law firm Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP on behalf of Boyd Gaming: $ 100.00, receipt number 8876. (ECS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2012: # 1 Receipt) (ECS).
January 20, 2012 9 Featured Case TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2012 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Responses due by 1/27/2012. Replies due by 1/31/2012. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/20/12. (Copies have been distributed to L. Bielinski; T. Peterson - MMM)
January 20, 2012 8 Featured Case ORDER Granting 2 Motion to Temporarily Seal Case. FURTHER ORDERED that the case remain sealed until (1) registrar compliance with any court order granting plaintiff's motion for TRO, and (2) service of the order and other filings upon defendant. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/20/12. (Copies have been distributed by mail to L. Bielinski; T. Peterson - MMM)
January 19, 2012 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Boyd Gaming Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (ASB)
January 5, 2012 6 Summons Issued as to King Zulu, LLC. (ECS)
January 5, 2012 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Boyd Gaming Corporation. Motion ripe 1/5/2012. (ECS)
January 5, 2012 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint) (ECS)
January 5, 2012 3 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (ECS)
January 5, 2012 2 MOTION to Temporarily Seal Case by Plaintiff Boyd Gaming Corporation. Motion ripe 1/5/2012. (ECS)
January 5, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against King Zulu, LLC (Filing fee $ 350), filed by Boyd Gaming Corporation. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/15/2012. Proof of service due by 5/4/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ECS)
January 5, 2012 Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (JAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd Gaming Corporation v. King Zulu, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King Zulu, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boyd Gaming Corporation
Represented By: Laura Bielinski
Represented By: Joanna M Myers
Represented By: Tamara Beatty Peterson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]