AEVOE CORP. v. AE Tech Co., Ltd.

Plaintiff: Aevoe Corp.
Defendant: AE Tech Co., Ltd.
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00053
Filed: January 11, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2012 131 Featured Case ORDER granting 127 Motion for Leave to File Certain Document Excerpts under Seal re 128 Reply to Response to Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 10/2/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 16, 2012 132 Featured Case ORDER that 75 Motion for Sanctions is granted. Plaintiff's supplemental brief is due by 10/30/2012. Defendants' supplemental brief is due by 11/6/2012. Evidentiary Hearing is set for 11/19/2012 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/15/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MJZ)
November 9, 2012 155 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 11/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 9, 2012 156 Featured Case ORDER Granting 125 Stipulation re 80 Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 11/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 24, 2012 16 Featured Case PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/24/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 10, 2012 179 Featured Case ORDER Granting 173 Motion for Leave to File under Seal. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/10/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 10, 2012 180 Featured Case ORDER Granting 174 Motion for Leave to Request the Court to File Publicly a Redacted Version of the November 27, 2012 Sealed Order. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/10/12. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 17, 2012 186 Featured Case ORDER Denying 182 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/17/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 5, 2013 202 Featured Case ORDER that 111 , 115 Motion to Compel is Granted in part and Denied in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 6, 2013 216 Featured Case ORDER Denying 72 Motion for Clarification of Preliminary Injunction Order. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/6/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 7, 2013 217 Featured Case ORDER that 67 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims; and 68 Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses are GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file their amended complaint by March 22, 2013. Failure to file an amended complaint by that date will result in the Court striking Defendants Fifth Affirmative Defense and dismissing Defendants Unenforceability and False Marking Counterclaims. FURTHER ORDERED that 91 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/7/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 19, 2013 250 Featured Case ORDER SETTING HEARING re 218 Motion to Compel. The Hearing is set for 4/29/2013 at 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/19/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 23, 2013 253 Featured Case ORDER that 190 Motion For Leave to Register Sanctions Award Order in Foreign Districts is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/23/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 6, 2013 277 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 218 Motion to Compel. To the extent the motion to compel is granted above, Plaintiff shall provide the compelled discovery responses within 20 days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/6/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 14, 2013 287 Featured Case ORDER that the 15 claim terms submitted by the parties are construed as contained within this Order. See Order for details. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case shall be referred to Magistrate Judge Koppe for the setting of the Post-Claim Construction Order Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 05/14/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
May 24, 2013 308 Featured Case ORDER Granting 282 Motion to File Selected Document Excerpts and Exhibits Thereto Under Seal. The documents identified above may remain under seal and no further filing of redacted versions is required. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/24/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) Modified signing Judge on 5/24/2013. (MAJ)
July 10, 2013 332 Featured Case ORDER Granting 285 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 10, 2013 333 Featured Case ORDER re 301 and 325 MOTIONS to Seal. Plaintiff is ORDERED, no later than July 15, 2013. to either file a declaration establishing good cause for the sealing or withdraw the designation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 10, 2013 334 Featured Case ORDER Amending 155 Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 15, 2013 337 Featured Case ORDER 325 Motion to Seal is GRANTED in part. The unredacted Exhibit at Docket No. 326 will remain under seal. No later than July 22, 2013, Defendants shall refile on the public docket that exhibit with the redactions previously approved for Docket No. 257-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/15/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 15, 2013 338 Featured Case ORDER that 301 Motion to Seal is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/15/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 26, 2013 345 Featured Case ORDER that 145 Motion to Reconsider and Vacate the Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 27, 2013 346 Featured Case ORDER that 296 Motion to Stay is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/27/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 27, 2013 347 Featured Case ORDER. The Court currently has scheduled a hearing for September 3, 2013, for the motions at Docket Nos. 243 and 251 . See Docket No. 343 . The Court hereby issues this order to advise counsel of an additional issue they should be prepared to address at that hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/27/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 30, 2013 349 Featured Case ORDER that 324 Motion to Compel is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/30/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 30, 2013 350 Featured Case ORDER that 251 Motion to Quash is GRANTED. Racing Optics also seeks an award of sanctions pursuant to Rule 45(c)(1). The Court does not find that an award of fees is appropriate here, and DENIES that aspect of the motion. The Court finds this motion properly resolved without oral argument and hereby VACATES the hearing on this motion set for September 3, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/30/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 4, 2013 352 Featured Case ORDER that Plaintiffs counsel shall explain what additional precautions are available. Counsel shall provide information, no later than September 11, 2013, in a filing of five pages or less. Defendants shall provide their position with respect to a prosecution bar, no later than September 11, 2013, in a filing of five pages or less. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/4/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 4, 2013 353 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 256 and 257 Defendant's Second Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall provide supplemental interrogatory answers within 14 days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 09/04/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
September 9, 2013 361 Featured Case ORDER Temporarily Unsealing Transcript of the sealed portion of Motion Hearing held 9/3/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/9/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 13, 2013 368 Featured Case ORDER Temporarily Unsealing Transcript of the sealed portion of the Motion Hearing held 9/3/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/13/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 20, 2013 373 Featured Case ORDER that 206 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Court hereby awards Plaintiff $10,512 in attorneys' fees and $1,395.52 in costs. Payment shall be made no later than October 10, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/20/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 17, 2013 393 Featured Case ORDER that Plaintiff and Movants shall submit a supplemental brief of no longer than 10 pages by 10/24/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 18, 2013 394 Featured Case ORDER that Defendants shall submit a declaration no later than 10/25/2013 in support of the 315 MOTION to Seal explaining why the information at issue merits secrecy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 18, 2013 395 Featured Case ORDER that Defendants shall submit a declaration no later than 10/25/2013 in support of the 305 MOTION to Seal explaining why the information at issue merits secrecy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 18, 2013 397 Featured Case ORDER that no later than 10/25/2013, Plaintiff shall submit supplemental materials further supporting 292 Motion to Seal as it relates to its exhibits. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 7, 2012 43 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 25 Motion to Reconsider and Vacate the Preliminary Injunction. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/7/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 6, 2013 441 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 243 Motion for Protective Order and Attorney's Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/6/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 27, 2013 463 Featured Case ORDER that 292 Motion to Seal is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Docket No. 293 willremain under seal, but Defendants are ORDERED to file, within 14 days of this order, a newly-redacted version of that motion consistent with the Court's instructions above. FURTHER ORDERED that 305 Motion to Seal is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Clerk is DIRECTED to unseal 306 in its entirety. FURTHER ORDERED that 315 Motion to Seal is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Clerk i s DIRECTED to unseal 316 in its entirety. FURTHER ORDERED that 357 Motion to Seal is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Docket No. 358 will remain under seal, but Defendants are ORDERED to file, within 14 days of this order, a newly-redacted ve rsion of that motion consistent with the Court's instructions above. FURTHER ORDERED that 382 Motion to Seal is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Docket No. 383 will remain under seal, but Defendants are ORDERED to file, within 14 days of this order, a newly-redacted version of that brief consistent with the Court's instructions above. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/27/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 19, 2013 490 Featured Case ORDER that 466 Motion to to Reset Trial Dates is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the calendar call set for Monday, January 13, 2014 at 9:00 AM and the jury trial set for Tuesday, January 21, 2014 are VACATED, to be rescheduled upon the filing of th e Proposed Pretrial Order in accordance with Local Rule 26-1(e)(5). FURTHER ORDERED that 486 Stipulation for Extension of Time regarding Pretrial Order and Motions in Limine is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/19/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 24, 2014 511 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 504 Unopposed Motion to Seal. Within 7 days of the issuance of this order, Plaintiff shall file a public version of that opposition brief without the proposed redaction on page 5 of Docket No. 445 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 02/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 25, 2014 512 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 240 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss 231 and 232 Amended Counterclaims and Denying 242 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defense of Inequitable Conduct. Defendants' Counterclaim for False Marking is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 02/25/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 18, 2014 518 Featured Case ORDER Denying 494 Defendants' Motion to Dissolve the Preliminary Injunction and Granting in part 273 Defendants' Motion to Increase the Preliminary Injunction Bond. Defendants' Motion is GRANTED to the extent of an increase in the preliminary injunction bond to $500,000. Plaintiff shall post the increased bond by 4/2/2014. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 03/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 19, 2014 519 Featured Case ORDER Granting 289 and 293 Plaintiff's Motions for Order to Show Cause. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/10/2014 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, prior to the Show Cause Hearing, the parties shall meet and confer in an attempt to resolve this issue. The parties shall jointly file, by 4/7/2014 a Joint Statement certifying that such a meet and confer occurred. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 03/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 31, 2014 521 Featured Case ORDER Denying 344 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 03/31/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
April 10, 2014 525 Featured Case MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Show Cause Hearing held on 4/10/2014 before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Crtrm Administrator: Eileen Wood; Pla Counsel: David Bloch, Kristen Gallagher; Def Counsel: Lynn Alstadt, Raleigh Thompson; Court Recorder: Araceli Bareng; Time of Hearing: 2:03-6:19 PM; Courtroom: 7D. See attached Minutes. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
April 14, 2014 528 Featured Case ORDER Temporarily Unsealing Transcripts. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 04/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
April 14, 2014 529 Featured Case ORDER Denying as moot 409 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of False Marking and Denying as moot 439 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 04/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
April 17, 2014 532 Featured Case ORDER Granting 354 Plaintiff's Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order and Granting 289 and 293 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants AE Tech, S&F Corporation and Greatshield In c. are jointly and severally liable for the full payment of the $1,067,947.56 in lost profits and $60,941.75 in attorneys' fees as compensation to Aevoe. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant AE Tech is separately and individually li able for the full payment of $11,812.52 in lost profits as compensation to Aevoe in connection with the resale of redesigned infringing products that did not involve the S&F Defendants. Defendants shall have until 6/10/2014 to pay in full the amounts as ordered above and to certify with the Court that they have fully paid. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 04/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
April 30, 2014 538 Featured Case ORDER Granting 534 Defendant's Motion to Seal 535 Exhibits 1A-5A and 7. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 04/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 9, 2014 550 Featured Case ORDER that Defendant AE Tech shall file a Reply to 542 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by 6/12/2014. Motion Hearing re 542 Motion to Withdraw reset for 6/20/2014 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Defendant AE Tech's current counsel of record shall serve this order and shall file a proof of service by 6/10/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 06/09/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 13, 2014 556 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 545 and 546 Defendants' Motion to Seal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a public version of Exhibit 4 to 546 SEALED Motion for Leave to file Selected Exhibits to 544 Motion for Reconsideration Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 06/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
July 18, 2014 570 Featured Case ORDER discharging 566 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
July 18, 2014 571 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 560 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
July 29, 2014 582 Featured Case ORDER Denying 425 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 8, 2014 592 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 574 Motion to Seal 573 Declaration. A renewed motion to seal must be filed no later than August 15, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
August 20, 2014 599 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 412 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The '942 Patent is valid and infringed. However, issues of fact preclude summary judgment on the amount of damages for Defendants' pat ent infringement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit their Joint Pretrial Order within 30 days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case shall be referred to Magistrate Judge Koppe for the setting of the Pretrial Settlement Conference. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 20, 2014 601 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 369 Motion to exclude Expert Testimony of Feon Tan and denying 371 Motion to exclude the Report and Testimony of John White. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
August 26, 2014 604 Featured Case ORDER granting 596 Motion to Seal. Accordingly, the proposed redactions sought through the renewed motion to seal are proper and the motion to seal is therefore GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
August 26, 2014 605 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part as moot 589 Motion to Seal. Exhibit A 591 is DENIED as moot. Exhibit B 591 is DENIED as moot. Exhibit C 591 is GRANTED as to the proposed redactions to Exhibit C. Exhibit D 591 is GRANTED as to the proposed redactions to Exhibit D. Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Withdraw 590 is GRANTED as to the proposed redactions to Plaintiff's response to the motion to withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
May 2, 2012 65 Featured Case ORDER Granting 49 MOTION for Order to Show Cause. Defendants are immediately enjoined from selling the redesigned screen protector that is the subject of the contempt proceeding. Plaintiffs shall submit for the Court's consideration an affidavit and brief relating to the monetary sanctions that the Court should award by May 11, 2012 at 5:00 p.m. Defendants' response is due by June 8, 2012 at 5 p.m. and Plaintiff's reply is due on June 15, 2012 at 5 p.m. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/2/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 2, 2012 66 Featured Case ORDER and PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/2/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 18, 2012 83 Featured Case ORDER Granting 74 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/18/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 12, 2012 8 Featured Case TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/23/2012 08:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Gloria M. Navarro. AE Tech Co., Ltd. answer due 1/18/2012. Replies due by 1/20/2012. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/12/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: AEVOE CORP. v. AE Tech Co., Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aevoe Corp.
Represented By: David S Bloch
Represented By: Josephine Binetti McPeak
Represented By: Jeffrey A Silvestri
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AE Tech Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Lynn J Alstadt
Represented By: JP Hendricks
Represented By: Steve L. Morris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]