Southern Terrace Homeowners Association v. Viega, Inc. et al

Defendant: Uponor Wirsbo Company, Zenith of Nevada, Inc., Uponor, Inc., VG Pipe, LLC, Vanguard Industries, Inc., Vanguard Piping Systems, Inc., Viega GmbH & Co., KG, Viega International GMBH, Viega, Inc., Viega, LLC, Wirsbo Company, Uponor Corporation and Meritage Homes of Nevada Inc
Plaintiff: Southern Terrace Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2012cv00206
Filed: February 8, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2012 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 92 Motion to Stay and Granting 98 Motion to Stay Discovery to the extent that a temporary stay is entered pending a decision concerning whether this action will be transferred for consolidated pre-trial proceedings to Chief Judge Jones and Magistrate Judge George W. Foley. Counsel for the parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order within 14 days of decision on the request to transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 07/10/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 3, 2012 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 137 Motion to to Transfer for lack of jurisdiction and Denying 135 Motion to Extend Time re 1 Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 07/27/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
September 25, 2012 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 153 Defendants' Renewed Motion to Stay. This case shall be stayed pending decision on the motions to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 09/25/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 8, 2013 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that all claims related to the Vanguard/Viega plumbing system are SEVERED from the following cases: Southern Terrace Homeowners Association v. Viega, Inc., No. 2:12-cv-206; and Anthem Highlands Community Association v. Viega, Inc. , No. 2:12-cv-207. FURTHER ORDERED that the Vanguard/Viega claims severed from the Southern Terrace Homeowners Association v. Viega, Inc., No. 2:12-cv-206; and Anthem Highlands Community Association v. Viega, Inc., No. 2:12-cv-2 07 actions are CONSOLIDATED for all purposes, including discovery and trial, as member cases into the lead Vanguard/Viega case Waterfall Homeowners Association v. Viega, Inc., No. 2:11-cv-1498. FURTHER ORDERED that all discovery in the consolidated Uponor/Wirsbo and Vanguard/Viega actions shall be coordinated to the greatest extent possible so as to minimize the expense and burden on all parties in these actions.FURTHER ORDERED that all further Vanguard/Viega-related plead ings and papers shall be filed in the lead Vanguard/Viega case only. Plaintiffs in the lead Vanguard/Viega case shall have leave to file a consolidated amended complaint within 10 days of entry of this order. The amended complaint shall not add addit ional legal theories and shall conform to all of the Courts prior orders in the Waterfall action.FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter this Order into the dockets of this action, the lead Vanguard case, and the two Vanguard member cases. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/8/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 10, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record 73 is GRANTED. Elaine K. Fresch and Gil Glancz of Selman Breitman LLP will continue to represent Defendant Zenith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Terrace Homeowners Association v. Viega, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor Wirsbo Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zenith of Nevada, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VG Pipe, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Industries, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Piping Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viega GmbH & Co., KG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viega International GMBH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viega, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viega, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wirsbo Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meritage Homes of Nevada Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Terrace Homeowners Association
Represented By: Scott K. Canepa
Represented By: James D. Carraway
Represented By: J. Randall Jones
Represented By: Francis I Lynch
Represented By: Robert C. Maddox
Represented By: Terry W. Riedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]