Drover v. LG Electronics USA, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kevin Drover
Defendant: LG Electronics USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv00510
Filed: March 27, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 19 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The motion is GRANTED as to plaintiffs claim under the Nevada Deceptive Trade Practices Act. This claim is DISMISSED without prejudice. The motion is DENIED AS MOOT as to plaintiffs claims for breach of express warranty and breach of implied warranty of merchantability because plaintiff voluntarily dismissed these claims. The motion is DENIED as to plaintiffs claim for unjust enrichment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED th at Plaintiff, if he chooses to amend his complaint, file the Motion to Amend, attaching the proposed Amended Complaint, within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Amended Complaint deadline: 11/17/2012. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/18/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 19, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 50 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiffs unjust enrichment claim be, and the same hereby is, dismissed with prejudice. Amended Complaint due within 30 days. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 7, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 60 Plaintiff's Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff if he chooses to amend his complaint, file a motion to amend attaching the proposed Amended Complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/6/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 22, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 71 Defendant LG Electronics USA, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's first cause of action is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's second cause of action i s DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall have 30 days from the entry of this order to file a second amended complaint. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/22/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 15, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 80 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the entry of this order to file a third amended complaint. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drover v. LG Electronics USA, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Drover
Represented By: William B. Federman
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Represented By: Joseph A. Liebman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen T. Gallagher
Represented By: Melanie Grossman
Represented By: Patricia K Lundvall
Represented By: Sandra C McCallion
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]