United States of America v. Tewolde et al

Defendant: Yordanos Kidane, Koraggio, LLC and Benyam Tewolde
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2012cv00516
Filed: March 28, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Injunction
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that parties shall file Joint Interim Discovery Status Reports on 10/3/12 and 12/3/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 8/31/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 27, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 26 Plaintiff's Motion for Permanent Injunction. The parties shall file a stipulation and order for dismissal within fifteen (15) days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/27/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 27, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court PERMANENT INJUNCTION against Benyam Tewolde. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/27/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 27, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court PERMANENT INJUNCTION against Yordanos Kidane and Koraggio, LLC. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/27/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 16, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Final Judgment in favor of Plaintiff United States of America and against Defendants Benyam Tewolde, Yordanos Kidane, and Koraggio, LLC, doing business as Instant Tax Service. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/15/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Tewolde et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yordanos Kidane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koraggio, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benyam Tewolde
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nathan E Clukey
Represented By: Russell J Edelstein
Represented By: Sean Green
Represented By: Jose A Olivera
Represented By: Blaine T Welsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]