Wyrick v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Saner Wyrick
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00566
Filed: April 5, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for the Filing of a Stipulated Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by 6/4/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/24/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
August 8, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 21 Defendant American Mutual Insurance Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/8/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 26, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 29 Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wyrick v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saner Wyrick
Represented By: Roger M Cram
Represented By: David A. Francis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert W Freeman, Jr.
Represented By: Isaiah A. Jerez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]