Boart Longyear Company et al v. Diamantina Christensen Trading, Inc. et al

Defendant: Christensen Chile S.A., Diamantina Christensen Trading, Inc., Intermountain Drilling Supply Corp. and Boyles Bros Diamantina S.A.
Plaintiff: Longyear TM, Inc. and Boart Longyear Company
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00689
Filed: April 25, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court BRIEFING ORDER for Claim Construction. Opening brief due by 1/11/2013. Reply brief due by 2/1/2013. Responses due by 1/25/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/5/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 28, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 57 Proposed Amended Briefing Order for Claim Construction. Opening brief due by 3/6/2013. Responses due by 3/20/2013. Replies due by 3/27/2013. Pre-Claim Construction Settlement Conference deadline is 1/18/2013. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/28/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 4, 2012 78 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Granting 74 Stipulation Request to Amend Scheduling Order. This stipulation does not alter the claim construction briefing schedule set forth in the Amended Briefing Order for Claim Construction 58 and the Tutorial Hearing on April 3, 2013 and the Markman Hearing on April 10, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/4/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 16, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Boart Longyear Company, Longyear TM, Inc. and against Intermountain Drilling Supply Corp. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 1/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Boart Longyear Company et al v. Diamantina Christensen Trading, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christensen Chile S.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamantina Christensen Trading, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intermountain Drilling Supply Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyles Bros Diamantina S.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Longyear TM, Inc.
Represented By: Vincent J. Allen
Represented By: Bobby W. Braxton
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Zachary W. Hilton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boart Longyear Company
Represented By: Bobby W. Braxton
Represented By: Vincent J. Allen
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Zachary W. Hilton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]