Cooper et al v. Ningbo Xingqiang Metallic Products Co., Ltd.

Plaintiff: Sandy Cooper and Garden Meadow, Inc.
Defendant: Ningbo Xingqiang Metallic Products Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2012cv00698
Filed: April 26, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/18/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 28, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT and DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs Garden Meadow, Inc. and Sandy Cooper against Defendant Ningbo Xingqiang Metallic Products Co., Ltd. in the sum of $2,850,000 for compensatory damages; and in the sum of $26,254.18 for attorney fees and costs; and in the sum of $4,702.50 for prejudgment interest. PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/27/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 7, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 30 Motion for Entry of Order Directing Service of Injunction and Impounding Infringing Products. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 5/7/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 27, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for TRO. Responses due by 5/1/2012, Replies due by 5/3/2012 and Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2012 at 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan re Motion for Preliminary Injunction 7 . See Order for details. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper et al v. Ningbo Xingqiang Metallic Products Co., Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Cooper
Represented By: L. Chrisopher Rose
Represented By: Tyler Nichols Ure
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garden Meadow, Inc.
Represented By: L. Chrisopher Rose
Represented By: Tyler Nichols Ure
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ningbo Xingqiang Metallic Products Co., Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]