Las Vegas Sands Corp. v. Sandcash.com Featured Case

Defendant: Sandcash.com
Plaintiff: Las Vegas Sands Corp.
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00729
Filed: May 1, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2012 8 CERTIFICATE of Cash Deposit as to Las Vegas Sands Corp.: $ 100, receipt number 1111 (SLR)
May 3, 2012 7 Featured Case TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Granting 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Deadlines: Responses due by 5/11/2012. Replies due by 5/14/2012. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2012 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 4A before Judge Miranda M. Du. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/3/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
May 2, 2012 6 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint) (SLR)
May 2, 2012 5 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (SLR)
May 2, 2012 Case assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston. ***Emergency motion previously filed in case.*** (SLR)
May 1, 2012 4 DECLARATION of Gayle M. Hyman re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; by Plaintiff Las Vegas Sands Corp.. (Krieger, John)
May 1, 2012 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Las Vegas Sands Corp.. Responses due by 5/18/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Krieger, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of John Krieger, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of John Krieger, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of John Krieger, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of John Krieger, # 6 Proposed Order)(Krieger, John)
May 1, 2012 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Las Vegas Sands Corp.. Motion ripe 5/1/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Krieger, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of John Krieger, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of John Krieger, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of John Krieger, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of John Krieger, # 6 Proposed Order)(Krieger, John)
May 1, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against Sandcash.com (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-2354641), filed by Las Vegas Sands Corp.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/11/2012. Proof of service due by 8/29/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Krieger, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Las Vegas Sands Corp. v. Sandcash.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandcash.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Las Vegas Sands Corp.
Represented By: Stephanie Buntin
Represented By: John L. Krieger
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]