Brady Industries, LLC v. Waxie's Enterprises, Inc.

Defendant: Waxie's Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brady Industries, LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00777
Filed: May 9, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2012 20 Featured Case ORDER re 19 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Edward J. O'Connor as to Defendant Waxie's Enterprises, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/29/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 2, 2013 42 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER Approving 41 Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order with the exception of language in paragraph 15. The deleted language in Paragraph 15 of the parties 41 Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protectiv e Order is NOT APPROVED. The parties must comply with the requirements of Local Rule 10-5(b) and the Ninth Circuits decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, with respect to any documents filed under seal or used at trial. The parties 41 Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order, as modified and signed by the court, is APPROVED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 08/02/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 21, 2014 56 Featured Case ORDER Denying 45 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Granting in part and Denying in part 46 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/20/2014. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 1/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 24, 2014 59 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 2/24/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
August 5, 2014 69 Featured Case ORDER Approving 68 Notice of Settlement of Entire Action and this action is hereby closed. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 8/5/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 18, 2014 72 Featured Case Order re 71 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorney fees and costs. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 8/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brady Industries, LLC v. Waxie's Enterprises, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waxie's Enterprises, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brady Industries, LLC
Represented By: Peter H. Ajemian
Represented By: Mark G Tratos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]