Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Health and Welfare Trust et al v. Williams Brother, Inc.

Defendant: Michael Peek and Williams Brother, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trustees Of The Construction Industry And Laborers Joint Pension Trust, Trustees Of The Construction Industry And Laborers Vacation Trust, Trustees Of The Southern Nevada Laborers Local 872 Training Trust and Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Health and Welfare Trust
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00810
Filed: May 14, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER Granting 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Not later than March 1, 2013, Defendants' withdrawing counsel of record Robert Robbins is ORDERED to serve this order on Defendants Michael Peek and Williams Brother, Inc. and to file a proof of service. Defendant Michael Peek is hereby ORDERED to file no later than March 26, 2013, a certification that he will be proceeding in this case pro se or an appearance of newly retained counsel. Williams Brother, Inc. is hereby ORDERED to retain counsel and have counsel enter a notice of appearance in this case no later than March 26, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall add the last known address (as listed in the order) for Defendants Williams Brother, Inc. and Michael Peek to the civil docket and serve Defendants with a copy of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 26, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER to Show Cause Why Defendant Michael Peek Should Not be Sanctioned. No later than March 1, 2013, Defendants' withdrawing attorney of record Robert Robbins, is ORDERED to serve this order to show cause on defendant Michael Peek and to file a proof of service. The Court hereby ORDERS Defendant Michael Peek show cause in writing no later than March 11, 2013, why the Court should not issue sanctions against them for failure to comply with a Court order up to and including entry of default judgment, pursuant to Local Rule IA 4-1, Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f), and/or the Courts inherent authority. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - mailed copy to each address listed in 19 - SLD)
March 13, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER TO APPEAR. The Court hereby orders Michael Peek, Robert Robbins, and John Muije to appear for a hearing on 4/4/2013 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Both Robert Robbins and John Muije are further ORDE RED to serve on Michael Peek this Order to Appear and to file a proof of service thereof, no later than March 19, 2013. The Clerk of Court is instructed to mail this order to Robert Robbins and John Muije at the address listed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/12/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 26, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER Granting the 29 Report and Recommendation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court enter default as to Defendant Williams Brother, Inc. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 26, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER Granting 15 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court enter JUDGMENT for Plaintiffs and against Williams Brother, Inc., a Nevada Corporation, and Michael Peek, an individual, jointly and severally in the amount of $66,601. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Health and Welfare Trust et al v. Williams Brother, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Peek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Brother, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees Of The Construction Industry And Laborers Joint Pension Trust
Represented By: Adam P. Segal
Represented By: Bryce C. Loveland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees Of The Construction Industry And Laborers Vacation Trust
Represented By: Bryce C. Loveland
Represented By: Adam P. Segal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees Of The Southern Nevada Laborers Local 872 Training Trust
Represented By: Bryce C. Loveland
Represented By: Adam P. Segal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Health and Welfare Trust
Represented By: Bryce C. Loveland
Represented By: Adam P. Segal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]