Gashtili et al v. JB Carter Properties II, LLC et al

Defendant: Bartus Carter, Fastran, LLC and JB Carter Properties II, LLC
Plaintiff: Nashrollah Gashtili and Integrated Dynamics Solutions, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00815
Filed: May 14, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs shall file their Certificate as to Interested Parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than 4:00 p.m., June 21, 2012. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/7/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 11, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Motion to Dismiss Nashrollah Gashtili as a Plaintiff is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Consolidated Defendant LLCs Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction case no. 2:12-cv-01156-MMD-PAL 3 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/11/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 22, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER that 9 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement is Granted in Part and Denied in Part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Consolidated Defendant LLC's 3 Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction (case no. 2:12-cv-1156-MMD-PAL) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 23, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 29 Counter Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Carter's Complaint 1 in case 2:12-cv-1156-MMD-PAL is DISMISSED with prejudice. All counterclaims in this consolidated action are DISMISSED. The Clerk of the Court is HEREBY ORDERED to terminate IDS, Gashtili, and Fastran, Inc. as Defendants and/or Consolidated Defendants in this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/23/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 5, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Counsel for the parties shall file a Joint Pretrial Order no later than 4:00 p.m. on 7/31/2013. Failure to timely comply may result in the imposition of sanctions up to and including a recommendation to the District Judge of case dispositive sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/5/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 30, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 44 Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Memorandum of Costs. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 24, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court finds that Defendants are the prevailing parties and entitled to reasonable attorneys' fees, but cannot determine based on the records presented whether the a ttorneys' fees requested are reasonable. The Court grants Defendants' request for costs in the amount of $373.50. Defendant are granted leave to file a renewed motion for attorneys' fees within 15 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/24/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 12, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 57 Integrated Dynamic Solutions, Inc.'s Motion for Attorney Fees and Memorandum of Costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants in the amount of $53,238.50 for attorneys' fees. The clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/12/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 12, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees entered in favor of Nashrollah Gashtili and Integrated Dynamic Solutions, Inc. and against JB Carter Properties Two, LLC, Bartus Carter, and Fastran, LLC in the amount of $53,238.50. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 5/12/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 31, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 66 Motion to Vacate. The judgment debtor examination of Defendant Bartus Carter III scheduled for 10/28/14 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/31/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gashtili et al v. JB Carter Properties II, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bartus Carter
Represented By: Michael R. Mushkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fastran, LLC
Represented By: Michael R. Mushkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JB Carter Properties II, LLC
Represented By: Michael R. Mushkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nashrollah Gashtili
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Donald Prunty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integrated Dynamics Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Donald Prunty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]