MedTrak VNG, Inc. v. AcuNetx, Inc et al

Defendant: Chapin Hunt and AcuNetx, Inc
Plaintiff: MedTrak VNG, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv00853
Filed: May 19, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 6 Motion for temporary restraining order. IT IS ORDERED Plaintiff and Defendants shall appear on August 2, 2012 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6B before Judge Lloyd D. George for a hearing on 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS that plaintiff shall serve notice upon defendants by July 6, 2012. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS defendants shall have until July 20, 2012 to file and serve briefs. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS plaintiff shall have until July 25, 2012 to reply. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 6/29/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
June 29, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 6/29/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
August 2, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 8/2/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
December 10, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 38 Motion to Set Aside Default. ORDERED that the default against defendant Chapin Hunt, individually, and only the default against Chapin Hunt, individually, is set aside. FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Chapin Hunt shall have 21 days from the date of this Order to file an answer or other appropriate responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 12/10/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 28, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 26 Motion for Default Judgment and an Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs, and Statutory Damages is DENIED without prejudice as to Defendant AcuNetx, Inc., and is DENIED as to Defendant Chapin Hunt. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/28/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 28, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 53 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order is DENIED, without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are to file a revised Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order in compliance with LR 26-1(d), including a statement of the reasons why longer or different time periods should apply to the case, within seven days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/28/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 26, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 46 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 6, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 58 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant AcuNetx, Inc. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 03/05/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 6, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff MedTrak VNG, Inc. against Defendant AcuNetx, Inc in the amount of $2,892,086.75 and for Attorney's Fees and Costs in the amount of $130,124.57. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 03/05/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
April 9, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for the parties shall file a Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/21/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 04/09/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
April 30, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 63 Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant Chapin Hunt with prejudice. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 04/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 8, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff shall file its Certificate as to Interested Parties, which fullycomplies with LR 7.1-1 no later than June 18, 2012. Failure to comply may result in the issuanceof an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/8/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
June 11, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re: 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 6/11/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MedTrak VNG, Inc. v. AcuNetx, Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapin Hunt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AcuNetx, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MedTrak VNG, Inc.
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Laraine M I Burrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]