Lagunas-Salazar et al v. Rockwell Collins, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Clementina Monroe-Miranda, Matgarito Lagunas-Salazar and Michelle Monroe
Defendant: Rockwell Collins, Inc. and Dale Summerland
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00867
Filed: May 22, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2012 13 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER that opposition to 11 Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Authorizations for Tax Returns on an Order Shortening Time is due 9/26/12. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's counsel will deliver one copy of Plaintiff Mat garito Lagunas-Salazar's 2004 through 2011 completed w-2 forms and tax returns to chambers, on or before 4:00pm, 9/26/12. DO NOT file with the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing re 11 Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of A uthorizations for Tax Returns on an Order Shortening Time is set for 9/28/2012 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/21/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 28, 2012 18 Featured Case ORDER re 11 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall produce to defendants on copy of Matgarito Lagunas-Salazars 2004 through 2011 completed tax returns, on or before 5:00 p.m., October 2, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/28/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 13, 2012 22 Featured Case ORDER Granting 15 Defendants' Motion to Strike George C. Swarts, CPA as Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Witness. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/13/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 30, 2013 45 Featured Case ORDER Granting 42 Motion to Compel The Deposition of Dr. Andrew Cash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 29, 2014 62 Featured Case ORDER Granting 49 Motion to Compel. Denying 51 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lagunas-Salazar et al v. Rockwell Collins, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clementina Monroe-Miranda
Represented By: Joseph N. Mott
Represented By: Steven J. Parsons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matgarito Lagunas-Salazar
Represented By: Steven J. Parsons
Represented By: Joseph N. Mott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Monroe
Represented By: Joseph N. Mott
Represented By: Steven J. Parsons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Collins, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin D Holtman
Represented By: Tamela L Kahle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Summerland
Represented By: Kevin D Holtman
Represented By: Tamela L Kahle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]