Bank of Las Vegas v. Cole et al

Defendant: Suzanne Whitaker, Steven R. Cole, Dan R. Richards and Southwest Appraisal Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bank of Las Vegas
Case Number: 2:2012cv00940
Filed: June 4, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 17 Motion to Compel Computation of Damages and for Sanctions. FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before October 25, 2012, plaintiff must pay defendants $500.00 for expenses incurred in association with filing the motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/11/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 7, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 6 and 9 Motions to Dismiss. Amended Complaint due within 5 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/7/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 23, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 31 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/23/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of Las Vegas v. Cole et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Whitaker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven R. Cole
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan R. Richards
Represented By: Nathan Reinmiller
Represented By: Nathan Severson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Appraisal Associates, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of Las Vegas
Represented By: Garry L. Hayes
Represented By: Martin L. Welsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]