Las Vegas Sands Corp. v. Traffic Label Limited

Defendant: Traffic Label Limited
Plaintiff: Las Vegas Sands Corp.
Case Number: 2:2012cv01043
Filed: June 19, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/2/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 14, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 18 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/13/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 14, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff Las Vegas Sands Corp. against Defendant Traffic Label Limited, in the amount of $100,000.00 for damages pursuant to the Anti-Cybersquatting Consumer Protection Act. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/13/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 20, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Motion Hearing re 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 7/2/2012 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Responses due by 6/26/2012. Replies due by 6/29/2012. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/20/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Las Vegas Sands Corp. v. Traffic Label Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traffic Label Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Las Vegas Sands Corp.
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.