Reno-Tahoe Specialty, Inc. v. Mungchi, Inc.

Plaintiff: Reno-Tahoe Specialty, Inc.
Defendant: Mungchi, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv01051
Filed: June 20, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2014 109 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Bench Trial (Day 1) held on 11/12/2014 before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Crtrm Administrator: Michael Zadina; Pla Counsel: John Krieger and Elias George; Def Counsel: Patrick Kang and Erica Loyd; Co urt Reporter/FTR #: Araceli Bareng; Time of Hearing: 8:32 AM to 4:10 PM; Courtroom: 7D; IT IS ORDERED that 104 Objections is denied. Plaintiff's witness: Gerald Gates; Defendant's witness: Ricky Seung Gon Noh. Exhibits admitted. Bench Trial continued to 11/13/2014 at 8:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MJZ)
November 13, 2014 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 104 First OBJECTIONS re LR IB 3-1 or MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re 101 Motion to Strike Fair Use and Copyright Validity Defenses Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/13/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
December 16, 2014 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 114 Motion for Release of Bond Obligation is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/16/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 25, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Reno-Tahoe Specialty, Inc. All copies and incarnations of the Infringing Works are to be surrendered to RTSI or its counsel by 8/1/2012. Plaintiff shall not be required to post an additional bond. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 07/25/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 18, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion to Withdraw and Amend Admissions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within fourteen (14) days from the entry of this order, defendant must pay to plaintiff $500.00 in monetary sanctions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if, after the court rules on the motion for partial summary judgment 38 , plaintiff perceives a need to conduct more discovery, plaintiff may file an appropriate motion with the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 16, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 56 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits and Information in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 10, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING 70 Report and Recommendation. Permanent injunction, statutory damages, attorneys' fees and non-taxable costs are GRANTED as set forth in the Order of Permanent Injunction, attached to Magistrate Judge Ferenbach's Report and Recommendation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file the order as a separate document on the docket, so that it can be signed by District Judge Gloria M. Navarro and entered by the Clerk of Court. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 10, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT and Permanent Injunction in favor of Plaintiff Reno-Tahoe Specialty, Inc. and against Defendants Top Design and Kyung Su Lee in the amount of $72,600.00, plus interest. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 10, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 53 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/10/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 8, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 79 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/7/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reno-Tahoe Specialty, Inc. v. Mungchi, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reno-Tahoe Specialty, Inc.
Represented By: John L. Krieger
Represented By: Nikkya G. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mungchi, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas B. Yoo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]