Liberty Media Holdings LLC v. FF Magnat Limited et al

Defendant: Maxim Bochenko and FF Magnat Limited
Plaintiff: Liberty Media Holdings LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01057
Filed: June 20, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2012 102 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 90 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Until PayPal, Inc. pays Plaintiff the sum of $550,000.00, as previously ordered, a total amount of $749,821.50 must remain frozen in Defendants PayPal account. Any sum exceeding that amount must be unfrozen. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 90 Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment is DENIED, as moot. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/27/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 4, 2012 114 Featured Case ORDER Granting 89 Plaintiff's Emergency Renewed Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $131,797.50. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Costs is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/4/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 4, 2012 115 Featured Case JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Liberty Media Holdings LLC against Oron.com in the amount of $131,797.50. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 9/4/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 21, 2012 11 Featured Case ORDER Granting 2 Motion for TRO. Motion Hearing re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and 6 MOTION to Appoint Receiver is set for 7/3/2012 02:30 PM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Responses to 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction are due by 5:00pm on 6/27/2012. Replies to 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction are due by 12:00pm on 7/2/2012. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/21/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 19, 2013 139 Featured Case ORDER Denying 107 Motion to Stay or Reconsider 102 Order. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 26, 2012 19 Featured Case ORDER that Defendant's request to advance Preliminary Injunction Hearing is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 15 Defendant's Emergency Motion for Partial Relief from the Temporary Restraining Order is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part , as stated in this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 16 Defendant's Motion to Extend Time for Briefing Schedule regarding the Hearing on Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED. A hearing re 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and 6 Motion to Appoint Receiver is set for 7/10/2012 02:30 PM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Gloria M. Navarro. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' answering papers shall be filed 7/3/12. Reply papers shall be filed 7/9/12. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/26/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 29, 2012 27 Featured Case ORDER that 20 and 24 Defendant's Emergency Motion for Disbursement of Additional Funds and Supplemental Motion are Granted in part and Denied in part as stated in this order. The Amended Temporary Restraining Order 13 is MODIFIED to permit PayPal to process payments for Oron.com, with any funds received by Oron.com to remain subject to the Court's Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/29/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 9, 2012 38 Featured Case ORDER Granting 37 Plaintiff Liberty Media Holdings, LLC's Motion to Replace ECF 17-2 and ECF 17-3. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/7/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 11, 2012 43 Featured Case ORDER Granting 42 Plaintiff Liberty Media Holding, LLC's Motion to Extend Time to Oppose 21 Defendant Bochenko's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Liberty's Opposition will be due 20 days after the Court rules on the Motion to Enforce Settlement. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/11/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 7, 2012 85 Featured Case ORDER Granting 33 Motion to Enforce Settlement. The Clerk shall enter judgment against "FF Magnat Limited, d/b/a Oron.com" and in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $550,000.00, and execution of that amount shall be issued f orthwith. FURTHER ORDERED that FF Magnat's account shall remain frozen, in order to satisfy any fee award, which may be sought by Plaintiff, but which must be brought within 30 days of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice against Defendant FF Magnat and Defendant Maxim Bochenko. FURTHER ORDERED that 32 Motion to Seal is DENIED. All documents filed under seal shall be immediately unsealed by the Clerk. FURTHER ORDERED that Motions 4 , 5 , 6 , [21 ], 68 , 70 and 73 are DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 34 Motion for Attorney's Fees remains under submission with the Court. FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion Hearing scheduled for Thursday, August 9, 2012 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 7D, is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/7/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 21, 2012 97 Featured Case ORDER Granting 96 Motion for Order Directing PayPal, Inc. to Satisfy Judgment by Plaintiff Liberty Holdings, LLC. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/21/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Liberty Media Holdings LLC v. FF Magnat Limited et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxim Bochenko
Represented By: Michael D Rounds
Represented By: Steven A. Caloiaro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FF Magnat Limited
Represented By: John Scott Burris
Represented By: David S. Kahn
Represented By: Anne E. Kearns
Represented By: Kenneth K. Keller
Represented By: Stevan Lieberman
Represented By: Michael D. Lisi
Represented By: Stan G. Roman
Represented By: Sheri M. Thome
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Media Holdings LLC
Represented By: James M DeVoy
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Represented By: Marc J Randazza
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]