Zuffa, LLC v. DOES 1-100 et al

Defendant: Vincent Woods, Business Entities 1-100 and DOES 1-100
Plaintiff: Zuffa, LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01120
Filed: June 27, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2012 14 Featured Case PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 07/18/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 12, 2012 15 Featured Case ORDER that Plaintiff is to file a Status Report by 1/2/2013. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/12/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 24, 2013 23 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon, on 5/24/2013. ORDER that 22 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default is DENIED without prejudice. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 23, 2013 26 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/23/2013 Granting 25 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Clerks Default against Defendants Carrana, Washington, Kidd, Sobalvarro, Simental, Cruikshank and Huff. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 3, 2013 30 Featured Case DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION in favor of Plaintiff Zuffa, LLC and against Defendants Albert Simental, Cedric Washington, Dadrian Huff, Darryl Cruikshank, Dennis Sonalvarro, Melvin Kidd, and Rudy Carranza. Plaintiff Zuffa, LLC is award ed judgment against Defendants on all claims in the First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is awarded statutory damages against Defendants, jointly and severally, in a total amount of $7,000.00, with post-judgment interest on the principal sum a t the judgment rate from the date of entry of the Judgment until paid in full. The Clerk of the Court shall refund to Plaintiff the $2000.00 deposited by Plaintiff as security for the temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction entered in this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/3/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - SLD)
June 28, 2012 7 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for TRO. See Order for details. Responses due by 7/5/2012,, Replies due by 7/6/2012, and Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2012 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Zuffa, LLC. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/28/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Zuffa, LLC v. DOES 1-100 et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Woods
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Business Entities 1-100
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zuffa, LLC
Represented By: John L. Krieger
Represented By: Nikkya G. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]