LT Game International Ltd. v. Shuffle Master, Inc.

Plaintiff: LT Game International Ltd.
Defendant: Shuffle Master, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01216
Filed: July 10, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 17 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that 37 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED in par and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/26/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 21, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 114 Motion to Seal 115 Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 30, 2014 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 80 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 107 Motion for Oral Argument re 80 is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 82 Motion to File Under Seal is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 93 Motion to File Under Seal is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 109 Motion to File Under Seal is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/30/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 29, 2014 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 64 Shuffle Master, Inc.'s Objections to Magistrate Judge Foley's Order on Non-Party DEQ's Motion to Quash areOVERRULED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/29/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 21, 2014 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 126 Plaintiff's Motion to File 127 and 128 Portions of Opposition and Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 21, 2014 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 133 Defendant's Motion to File Portions of 131 Reply Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 27, 2014 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 120 Motion to File Portions of MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/27/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 23, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 31 Submission of Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 01/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 28, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 24 Defendant Shuffle Master's Motion to Compel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall serve supplemental initial disclosures regarding the individuals whom it may call as witnesses and its computation of damages on or before February 11, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 11, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 47 Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory re: Examination of Witness in Macau. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 48 Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory re: International Judicial Assistance is D ENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file a revised application. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 49 Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory re: Request for Examination of Witness in Sing apore is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file Plaintiff's proposed requests for International Assistance 47 exhibit 1 and 49 exhibit 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/11/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: LT Game International Ltd. v. Shuffle Master, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LT Game International Ltd.
Represented By: Dariush Keyhani
Represented By: Amanda C Yen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shuffle Master, Inc.
Represented By: Eric T Aldrian
Represented By: Christopher R Miltenberger
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]