Kodi Bear Concepts, Inc. v. RHK Town Square, LLC

Plaintiff: Kodi Bear Concepts, Inc.
Defendant: RHK Town Square, LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv01223
Filed: July 11, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER that the oral argument set for 11/26/12 re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by RHK Town Square, LLC is VACATED. The court will issue a written order on the pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/17/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 18, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 8 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, with leave to amend in part. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/17/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 4, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall comply with the requirements of LR 10-5(b), and the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/3/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 4, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/4/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kodi Bear Concepts, Inc. v. RHK Town Square, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kodi Bear Concepts, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J Mack
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHK Town Square, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]