Sion v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Steven P. Sion
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01323
Filed: July 26, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 15 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 14 MOTION to Remand to Social Security. Responses due by 4/10/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/13/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 6, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 14 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to Social Security be DENIED. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that 22 Defendants Cross-motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 1/23/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 01/06/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC) Main Document 26 replaced to correct title of document on 1/7/2014. NEF Regenerated. (ASB)
January 27, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Accepting and Adopting 26 Report and Recommendation in full IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 14 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand is DENIED and 22 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 01/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 30, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Concerning Review of Social Security Cases. Plaintiff shall, within thirty (30) days of the filing of this Order to file a motion to remand on the basis of new evidence or file a motion for reversal. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/30/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sion v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven P. Sion
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]