Tippett v. U.S. Commissioner of Social Security et al

Defendant: Michael Astrue
Plaintiff: Evette Tippett
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01333
Filed: July 27, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Concerning Review of Social Security Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 5, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 14 Motion to Extend Time re 13 Order. Motion due by 5/5/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 5, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 18 Motion to Extend Time to File Motion for Remand and/or Reversal re 13 Order Concerning Review of Social Security Cases. Motion due by 6/30/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 2, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 21 Motion to Extend is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/2/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 3, 2012 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall file the Complaint and serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by certified mail. The Clerk shall issue summons to the US Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the US Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/2/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Tippett v. U.S. Commissioner of Social Security et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evette Tippett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]