Lee et al v. Spears

Plaintiff: Diversity Youth Sports, LLC and David Lee
Defendant: Darcy Spears
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01397
Filed: August 7, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
 
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 2 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. Plaintiff must provide certification by 10/22/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/2/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 4, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Complaint is dimsissed without prejudice with leave to amend within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/4/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 29, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting and Accepting 6 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's 5 Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 01/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lee et al v. Spears
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diversity Youth Sports, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darcy Spears
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]