Harmon v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Rhonda S. Harmon
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01419
Filed: August 10, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2012 11 Featured Case ORDER Granting 10 Motion to Serve Additional Party with Summons and Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/25/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: Summons and Complaint mailed to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region IX - SLR)
January 28, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER Denying as moot 14 Motion to Serve Party with Summons and Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 14, 2012 2 Featured Case ORDER Granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk of Court shall file the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration and the Attorney General of the United States by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint by certified mail to addresses listed in this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nev ada, and deliver with complaint to the US Marshal for service. Defendants shall have 60 days from the date of service to file answer or responsive pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Counsel, Mr. Kalagian, shall have 14 days from the date of this order to comply with LR IA 10-1(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/14/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 8, 2014 30 Featured Case ORDER Adopting in its entirety Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr.'s 27 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's 22 Motion to Remand is Granted. This matter is remanded to the to Social Security Administration for further administrative proceedings. FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's 25 Cross-Motion to affirm is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Harmon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda S. Harmon
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Represented By: Leonard H Stone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]