NNN Siena Office Park I 2, LLC et al v. Wachovia Bank National Association et al

Defendant: Wachovia Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank National Association, Stewart Title Company and Holland & Hart, LLP
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 8, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 5, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 7, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 40, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 41, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 39, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 4, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 37, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 38, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 35, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 36, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 33, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 34, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 31, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 32, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 29, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 3, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 27, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 28, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 25, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 26, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 21, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 24, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 20, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 2, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 17, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 13, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 10, LLC, NNN Siena Office Park I 12, LLC and NNN Siena Office Park I 22, LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01524
Filed: August 27, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2014 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 108 Stipulation for Dismissal of Fourth Claim for Relief with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/3/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 8, 2014 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant Wachovia's 72 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant Wachovia Bank National Association. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 8, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant Holland & Hart LLP's 86 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of Holland & Hart LLP. Defendant Holland & Hart LLP's 88 Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Witness is Denied as moot. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 19, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Paragraph twelve of the parties 25 Stipulation and Order Regarding Production of Confidential Information that does not requires them to file a contemporaneous motion for leave to file under seal as required by Local Rule 10-5(b) is NOT APPROVED and is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/19/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 4, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 32 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Laura E. Browning terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/4/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 15, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER responding to 36 LETTER requesting status of 10 MOTION to Dismiss. The 10 Motion to Dismiss does not fall within the category that requires expedited disposition and will therefore be decided in the order of pending motions in civil cases. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 15, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 10 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs Third Cause of Action for Unauthorized Mortgage Banker Activity in Violation of NRS 645E.900 and 6458.910 is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 12, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 60 Defendant's Letter for Status Request of 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 08/12/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
November 8, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/8/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
December 23, 2013 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 71 Supplemental Brief in Support of Holland & Hart's Request for Attorney Fees. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that attorneys fees in the amount of $3.012.50 are awarded in favor of Holland & Hart against the non-compliant Plaintiffs who were the subject of the motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: NNN Siena Office Park I 2, LLC et al v. Wachovia Bank National Association et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Bank National Association
Represented By: Laura E. Browning
Represented By: Justin R. Cochran
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Represented By: Laura E. Browning
Represented By: Justin R. Cochran
Represented By: Jeffrey Willis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Title Company
Represented By: Douglas D. Gerrard
Represented By: John Forest Hilbert
Represented By: Gary C. Milne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland & Hart, LLP
Represented By: Steve L. Morris
Represented By: Ryan M. Lower
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 8, LLC
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 5, LLC
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 7, LLC
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 40, LLC
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 41, LLC
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 39, LLC
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 4, LLC
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 37, LLC
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 38, LLC
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 35, LLC
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 36, LLC
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 33, LLC
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 34, LLC
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 31, LLC
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 32, LLC
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 29, LLC
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 3, LLC
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 27, LLC
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 28, LLC
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 25, LLC
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 26, LLC
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 21, LLC
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 24, LLC
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 20, LLC
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 2, LLC
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 17, LLC
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 13, LLC
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 10, LLC
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 12, LLC
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NNN Siena Office Park I 22, LLC
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]