YI v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Sang Yi
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2012cv01590
Filed: September 7, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 8 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Granting 13 Cross-Motion to Affirm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 10, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving and Adopting 17 Report and Recommendation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 8 Plaintiffs Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is DENIED and that the 13 Commissioners Cross-Motion to Affirm is GRANTED. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 05/10/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 13, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER that if Plaintiff intends to request a remand of this case on the basis of new medical evidence he shall file a motion to remand in this court by 1/14/2013. In the event Plaintiff does not file a motion to remand he shall file a motion for reversal and/or remand by 1/14/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/13/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YI v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sang Yi
Represented By: Steven M Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.